SIGHT ACTION (HAVERING)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work with, and on behalf of, vision impaired residents within the London borough of Havering, to provide support, advice and information, and to raise awareness of their needs with those responsible for service provision. We work closely with other groups and organisations, nationally and locally, to achieve this.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Havering
Governance
- 07 January 2000: Standard registration
- SIGHT ACTION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL THOMAS BRACE | Chair | 24 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Anna Slattery | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Colin John Linton | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Brice-Thompson | Trustee | 29 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Sandra Dawn Jane Steadman | Trustee | 10 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
JEAN HAGON | Trustee | 06 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR NEAL | Trustee | 06 October 2011 |
|
|||||
MAUREEN BRACE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.21k | £400 | £20.26k | £634 | £737 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.81k | £202 | £532 | £1.93k | £1.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/01/1998 AS AMENDED ON 10/08/1999 AS AMENDED ON 10/10/2004 AS AMENDED ON 15/10/2007 AS AMENDED ON 10/10/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF HAVERING AND ENVIRONS.
Area of benefit
DISTRICT OF HAVERING AND ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
R/O Harold Wood Methodist Church
The Drive
Harold Wood
ROMFORD
RM3 0DU
- Phone:
- 01708 375238
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window