TRANSFORMING LIVES FOR GOOD (TLG) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Early Intervention Project - behaviour coaching and mentoring UK wide for 7-11 year olds Make Lunch - providing lunches during school holiday periods for those in Food Poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£3,467,430
Donations and legacies | £1.83m | |
Charitable activities | £442.84k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.19m | |
Other | £707 |
Total expenditure:
£3,815,025
Raising funds | £390.89k | |
Charitable activities | £2.20m | |
Other | £1.23m |
-£432,583 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.62m | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.20m |
People

65 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
1696 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 February 1999: Standard registration
- 21 July 2020: Funds received from 1157093 MAKELUNCH
- 25 May 2021: Funds received from 1118995 THE CHILDREN'S FOOD TRUST
- 02 August 2023: Funds received from 1145270 STANSTED FAMILY CHURCH
- 25 April 2024: Funds received from 1193598 SERENDIPITY GIVING
- 14 May 2024: Funds received from 1168257 GLO ASHFORD CHURCH
- CJ'S COFFEE (Working name)
- CJ'S DINER AND COFFEE HOUSE (Working name)
- CJ'S TRAINING BASE (Working name)
- THE LIGHTHOUSE PROJECT (Working name)
- THE LIGHTHOUSE GROUP UK LTD (Previous name)
- THE LIGHTHOUSE OUTREACH (Previous name)
- TLG THE EDUCATION CHARITY (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy James Cooper | Trustee | 28 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Simon Benham | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Fafalios | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN KIRKBY | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sheron Delloris Kantor | Trustee | 31 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.29m | £6.03m | £4.58m | £4.75m | £3.47m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.85m | £5.18m | £5.02m | £4.96m | £3.82m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.84m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £798.87k | £40.39k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.55m | £3.26m | £1.84m | £2.34m | £1.83m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.97m | £1.96m | £1.79m | £1.44m | £442.84k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £767.72k | £819.50k | £943.62k | £964.73k | £1.19m | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £10.94k | £4.60k | £707 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.69m | £4.12m | £3.73m | £3.53m | £2.20m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.16m | £312.57k | £383.16k | £1.43m | £390.89k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £51.65k | £25.71k | £4.02k | £41.38k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £487.52k | £46.75k | £21.54k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £750.52k | £0 | £0 | £992.47k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £738.47k | £905.99k | £0 | £1.23m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £585.40k | £654.69k | £734.40k | £627.79k | £594.91k | |
|
Long-term investments | £5.28m | £5.38m | £5.92m | £6.34m | £5.91m | |
|
Other assets | £1.87m | £2.51m | £1.65m | £1.54m | £1.38m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £4.90m | £4.86m | £4.52m | £4.58m | £4.77m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 November 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 November 2021 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31/12/1998 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23/06/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 MAY 2018 AS AMENDED ON 18 FEB 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 FEB 2021
Charitable objects
A) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN BRADFORD AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION B SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE IN BRADFORD AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT C) TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT BY MEANS OF PROVIDING TRAINING FOR EMPLOYMENT FOR THOSE IN FINANCIAL AND ECONOMIC NEED IN BRADFORD AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT D) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN BRADFORD AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT E) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN BRADFORD AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
CENTRE OF EXCELLENCE
HOPE PARK
BRADFORD
BD5 8HH
- Phone:
- 01274900373
- Email:
- info@tlg.org.uk
- Website:
-
tlg.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window