Financial history THE MASTER FELLOWS AND SCHOLARS OF EMMANUEL COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity Number: 1137456
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £20.93m £19.74m £23.28m £21.38m £23.88m
Total expenditure £14.22m £16.06m £16.69m £20.03m £20.73m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £7.45m £7.70m £8.01m £5.19m £6.84m
Income - Other trading activities £261.13k £38.16k £372.33k £575.00k £780.11k
Income - Charitable activities £5.82m £5.50m £7.47m £7.89m £8.37m
Income - Endowments £42.41k £28.58k £21.76k £20.46k £1.47m
Income - Investment £7.00m £5.98m £7.37m £7.64m £7.63m
Income - Other £397.11k £520.55k £61.29k £91.53k £259.29k
Income - Legacies £2.97m £1.40m £1.34m £691.97k £1.16m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.32m £14.01m £14.11m £16.97m £17.35m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.20m £2.05m £2.58m £3.06m £3.38m
Expenditure - Governance £589.29k £587.21k £599.55k £630.79k £648.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £1.10m £1.18m £1.36m £1.42m £1.42m
Expenditure - Other £1.69m £0 £0 £0 £0