EATON VALE SCOUT & GUIDE ACTIVITY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's activities are in line with those of the Scout and Guide Associations. It aims to provide facilities for the leisure time occupation of children and young people which will assist them to grow to full maturity as individuals and as members of society and so that their conditions of life may be improved in so doing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£775,710
Donations and legacies | £10.00k | |
Charitable activities | £736.09k | |
Other trading activities | £18.93k | |
Investments | £10.69k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£559,393
Raising funds | £6.54k | |
Charitable activities | £552.85k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £6.54k | |
Charitable expenditure | £552.85k | |
Retained for future use | £216.32k |
People

21 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 03 February 1999: Standard registration
- EVAC (Working name)
- EATON VALE ACTIVITY CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Duncan Callaghan | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Kemp | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW BURRELL | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Waters | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN LUPSON | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Jayne Little | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Human | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Phil Wright | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £516.83k | £658.95k | £622.04k | £513.43k | £775.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £463.84k | £447.44k | £723.50k | £482.26k | £559.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £80.25k | £32.75k | £4.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £26.53k | £599.74k | £415.36k | £33.94k | £10.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £35.64k | £32.11k | £16.07k | £18.93k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £443.71k | £23.24k | £174.25k | £455.72k | £736.09k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £400 | £330 | £325 | £2.46k | £10.69k | |
|
Income - Other | £46.19k | £0 | £0 | £5.24k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £415.36k | £33.94k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £447.07k | £442.07k | £721.74k | £473.84k | £552.85k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £1.76k | £8.42k | £6.54k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £3.10k | £3.41k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £16.77k | £5.37k | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £701.65k | £678.20k | £681.29k | £653.21k | £713.46k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £183.37k | £405.44k | £288.34k | £355.06k | £469.18k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £69.55k | £56.66k | £44.11k | £51.58k | £9.63k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29TH OCTOBER 1998, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 13TH JANUARY 1999 AND 10 JUNE 2007
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE: FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THEIR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION SO AS TO ASSIST THEM TO GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED AND IN SO DOING: (A) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF AN OUTDOOR ACTIVITY CENTRE IN EATON VALE TO BE KNOWN AS THE EATON VALE SCOUT AND GUIDE ACTIVITY CENTRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUTH ORGANISATIONS (WHICH TERM SHALL INCLUDE THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION, THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION, AND SUBJECT TO THEM NOT BEING INCONSISTENT WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF SCOUTING AND GUIDING, SCHOOLS AND EVERY OTHER TYPE OF ORGANISATION OR BODY EITHER LOCAL, REGIONAL OR NATIONAL WHOSE AIM IS TO PROMOTE THE THE DEVELOPMENT AND NURTURE THE POTENTIAL OF YOUNG PEOPLE) AND WHICH WILL: (1) ENCOURAGE YOUNG PEOPLE TO BECOME ACTIVELY INVOLVED IN SPORTING, LEISURE AND CULTURAL ACTIVITIES AND ADDRESS THEIR PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL AND SPIRITUAL DEVELOPMENT TO ENABLE THEM TO ACHIEVE THEIR FULL POTENTIAL; (11) TO OPEN ALL YEAR ROUND AND PROVIDE BOTH CAMPING FACILITIES AND INDOOR FACILITIES OF A HOSTEL NATURE; (111) ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE THE ABLE BODIED, PHYSICALLY DISABLED AND THOSE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES TO PARTICIPATE AS EQUAL PARTNERS IN SPORTING. LEISURE AND CULTURAL ACTIVITIES; (1V) INCLUDE FACILITIES TO ENABLE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS TO SHARE TRAINING EXPERIENCE AND POOL TRAINING EQUIPMENT AND RESOURCES AND PROVIDE A CENTRE FOR TRAINING ADULTS WHO WORK WITH YOUNG PEOPLE; (B) TO MAINTAIN, MANAGE AND PROMOTE THE CENTRE AND ITS FACILITIES WHETHER ALONE OR IN CONJUNCTION WITH OTHERS FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUTH ORGANISATIONS FOR ACTIVITIES NOT INCONSISTENT WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF SCOUTING AND GUIDING; (C) TO INITIATE, SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGE PROJECTS AND ACTIVITIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE SCOUTING AND GUIDING PRINCIPLES OF CO-OPERATION, TEAM WORK AND CONCERN FOR THE INDIVIDUAL.
Area of benefit
EATON VALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH LANE
EATON
NORWICH
NORFOLK
NR4 6NN
- Phone:
- 01603501228
- Email:
- office@eatonvale.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window