BANGLADESH ASSOCIATION (SWINDON AREA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide and support the Bangladesh community in Swindon
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 11 June 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sofik Miah | Chair | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Avijit Debnath | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mahammed Abdur Rahim | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Rahim | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anwar Parvez Aftab | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Saifur Rahman Shamim | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Najmul Haque | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
ATAUAR HUJEL RAHMAN | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shahi Ahmed | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
AMIRUL HAQUE BABLU | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Mustaque Ahmed | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.56k | £22.90k | £18.89k | £12.43k | £4.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.67k | £31.34k | £7.96k | £28.61k | £13.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2024 | 255 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 MAY 1999
Charitable objects
1.TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A CENTRAL MEETING PLACE IN SWINDON, WHICH MAY SATISFY THE RELIGIOUS, SOCIAL AND CULTURAL REQUIREMENTS OF THE MEMBERS AND WHERE EDUCATIONAL. ARTISTIC AND SOCIAL ACTIVITIES MAY TAKE PLACE. 2. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE BANGLADESHI INHABITANTS WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE, SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, NATIONALITY, ETHNIC OR NATIONAL ORIGINS, RACE, COLOUR, MARITAL STATUS, DISABILITY, POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS BELIEFS: BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND THE INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, THE PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH AND RELIEF OF POVERTY DISTRESS OR SICKNESS AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
SWINDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
BANGLADESH ASSOCIATION
C/O BANGLADESH COMMUNITY CENTRE
74 COUNTY ROAD
74 County Road
SWINDON
SN1 2EW
- Phone:
- 07737401553
- Email:
- Bablu553@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window