Financial history ROCHDALE PHOENIX OPERA SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1074548
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £13.63k £0 £8.79k £12.62k £15.49k
Total expenditure £8.83k £433 £9.12k £11.83k £14.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A