Financial history ABERGAVENNY ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1076523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £7.93k £497 £8.11k £11.66k £10.97k
Total expenditure £7.51k £2.02k £6.32k £9.87k £11.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A