CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS WHITE, WARWICK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides interest-free loans for young people establishing a business in Warwick and also to young people who or whose parents are ordinarily resident in the Town of Warwick by making interest-free loans towards the cost of them undertaking tertiary education courses. Age restriction for both Business and Student loans can be seen on the Charity's web-site.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 15 January 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID BENNETT STEVENS | Chair | 13 March 2008 |
|
|||||
Simon James Ridley Hogg | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Francis Keeling KC | Trustee | 10 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Angela Thornton | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA SALLY FALL | Trustee | 14 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANITA WHITE | Trustee | 21 October 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £260.68k | £266.79k | £271.51k | £284.75k | £313.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £256.66k | £263.22k | £267.52k | £281.85k | £306.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME 10 JANUARY 2001
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST PERSONS IN NEED UNDER 35, BY MAKING INTEREST FREE LOANS WHICH WILL ESTABLISH THEM IN BUSINESS OR ASSIST THEM TO CONTINUE THEIR BUSINESS IN THE TOWN OF WARWICK; AND PERSONS IN NEED UNDER 35 WHOM OR WHOSE PARENTS ARE ORDINARILY RESIDENT IN THE TOWN OF WARWICK BY MAKING INTEREST FREE LOANS TOWARDS THE COST TO THEM OF UNDERTAKING FURTHER EDUCATION OR VOCATIONAL TRAINING.
Area of benefit
WARWICK
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 HIGH STREET
WARWICK
CV34 4AP
- Phone:
- 01926350555
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window