SOUTH WEST NOTTINGHAMSHIRE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As Scouts, we believe in preparing young people with skills for life. The South West Nottinghamshire Scout District supports Explorer Scout Units and the Scout Groups across Broxtowe District to encourage the young people to do more, learn more and be more. Each week, we support our members by providing the opportunity to enjoy fun and adventure while developing the skills they need to succeed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 16 February 1999: Standard registration
- SOUTH WEST NOTTS DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Stanley Heptinstall | Chair | 11 June 2015 |
|
|||||
Frank Janagap | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Connor Michael Lynch | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Deborah Anne Storer | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward Hewes | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Matthew Blakey | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Andrews | Trustee | 29 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Christopher James Phillips | Trustee | 29 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID RONALD PIDGEON | Trustee | 12 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY JAMES ORTON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.12k | £6.73k | £13.78k | £12.18k | £15.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.09k | £6.72k | £12.19k | £15.32k | £17.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 SYDNEY ROAD
NOTTINGHAM
NG8 1LH
- Phone:
- 01159284521
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window