Financial history LYSANDER PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1077795
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £30.28k £44.03k £28.93k £38.84k £36.53k
Total expenditure £37.74k £32.94k £35.71k £41.20k £39.49k
Income from government contracts £28.27k £37.08k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £16.59k £25.05k £21.04k