THE R C SNELLING CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1074776
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide assistance in the form of discretionary donations to individuals / organisations within a 30 mile radius of the village of Blofield, Norfolk provided the request has a medical, educational, religious, welfare or environmental resource connection. Donations made are not intended to form an on going relationship, (eg funding salaries) but more to meet specific needs (eg equipment, etc)

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 March 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NIGEL RUDOLF SAVORY Chair 28 March 2011
None on record
Philip Michael Christopher Gormley Trustee 09 January 2025
None on record
Paul Gerald Giles Trustee 22 June 2022
None on record
Mark Gook Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Diana Grace Michelle Jarrold Trustee 23 March 2022
JOHN JARROLD TRUST LTD
Received: On time
Samuel Barratt Trustee 19 June 2013
None on record
STEPHAN PHILLIPS Trustee 20 May 2011
None on record
TOBY WISE Trustee 16 February 2005
None on record
PHILIP JAN BUTTINGER Trustee 16 February 2005
BRITISH KORFBALL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ROWLAND ANDREW COGMAN Trustee 10 November 2004
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £12.79m £11.90m £14.39m £16.12m £16.09m
Total expenditure £12.55m £11.59m £14.16m £15.94m £15.98m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £10.00k £0 £884 £2.17k £1.41k
Income - Other trading activities £12.51m £11.40m £14.17m £5.50k £5.00k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £15.91m £15.82m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £217.75k £243.42k £188.39k £199.27k £259.13k
Income - Other £50.68k £258.24k £27.97k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £194.75k £165.88k £245.04k £207.96k £220.63k
Expenditure - Raising funds £12.36m £11.33m £13.88m £15.73m £15.76m
Expenditure - Governance £31.09k £23.06k £18.74k £19.26k £15.87k
Expenditure - Grants institution £122.83k £142.82k £226.29k £188.70k £204.76k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £3.28k £89.60k £38.44k £351 £570

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Own use assets £1.40m £1.42m £1.28m £1.31m £1.23m
Long-term investments £6.91m £7.44m £8.72m £8.48m £8.64m
Other assets £8.64m £7.35m £7.42m £8.40m £8.93m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £3.91m £2.26m £2.88m £3.62m £4.02m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 24 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 24 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 18 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 18 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 20 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 19 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 03 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 03 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
R C SNELLING LTD
LAUNDRY LANE
BLOFIELD
NORWICH
NR13 4SQ
Phone:
01603711737