LAKELAND ARTS SUPPORT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Generating income to provide financial support for Lakeland Arts at its Abbot Hall site in Kendal, Cumbria.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cumbria
Governance
- 02 June 1999: Standard registration
- THE L.D.A.G.A.M.T. SUPPORT TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Crewe | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Heather Tracey Dixon | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Akash Karwa | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|||||||||
CHRISTOPHER THOMAS STAFFORD BATTEN | Trustee | 14 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
MADELEINE MARY SCOTT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.48k | £33.91k | £65.98k | £47.81k | £46.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.51k | £69.68k | £58.49k | £145.96k | £72.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/11/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/05/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/07/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17/06/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF FUNDING FOR THE FACILITIES OF LAKELAND ARTS SPECIFICALLY, ABBOT HALL AND THE MUSEUM OF LAKELAND LIFE AND INDUSTRY IN KENDAL, CUMBRIA SO LONG AS IT REMAINS A REGISTERED CHARITY (NO: 1153001) AND SO LONG AS IT REMAINS IN EXISTENCE TO THE INTENT THAT IF LAKELAND ARTS IS NO LONGER A REGISTERED CHARITY OR NO LONGER EXISTS, OR IF IT SHALL CEASE TO OPERATE ABBOT HALL ART GALLERY IN KENDAL, THIS COMPANY SHALL BE WOUND-UP.
Area of benefit
KENDAL, CUMBRIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Blackwell Arts & Crafts House
Newby Bridge Road
Windermere
LA23 3JT
- Phone:
- 01539446139
- Email:
- info@lakelandarts.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window