Financial history KING GEORGE'S FIELD, LOWER HEYFORD

Charity number: 1075238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £6.67k £3.92k £12.19k £10.36k £15.72k
Total expenditure £5.85k £5.37k £9.68k £7.99k £12.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A