Financial history Play to the Crowd

Charity number: 1077139
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.52m £1.66m £1.93m £2.27m £2.61m
Total expenditure £2.13m £1.06m £1.86m £2.44m £2.60m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £646.56k £780.79k £560.73k £319.23k £280.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.04m £1.46m £763.90k £515.67k £604.20k
Income - Other trading activities £225.92k £85.33k £244.82k £323.19k £371.39k
Income - Charitable activities £1.25m £111.46k £918.05k £1.42m £1.61m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.90k £169 £180 £7.10k £24.20k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.98m £972.61k £1.71m £2.24m £2.41m
Expenditure - Raising funds £150.94k £86.40k £0 £194.61k £189.68k
Expenditure - Governance £10.36k £10.34k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £153.93k £0 £0