EMBRACE THE MIDDLE EAST

Charity number: 1076329
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Embrace the Middle East, formerly known as BibleLands, seeks to improve the lives of vulnerable and disadvantaged people in the Middle East. We do this in partnership with local Christians, focusing on education, healthcare and community development.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Egypt
  • Iraq
  • Israel
  • Lebanon
  • Occupied Palestinian Territories
  • Syria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 June 1999: Standard registration
  • 13 March 2023: Funds received from 281194 JUST CONNECTIONS
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • BIBLE LANDS (Working name)
  • BIBLELANDS (Previous name)
  • BIBLELANDS (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William John Clyde Mitchell OBE Chair 04 April 2019
None on record
Kristiina Wells Trustee 09 May 2024
None on record
Rev Iain Osborne Trustee 09 May 2024
None on record
Rev Joshua Lloyd Harris Trustee 22 September 2022
THE GUILD CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST KATHARINE CREE
Received: On time
The Rev Dr Munther Isaac Trustee 30 June 2021
None on record
Katherine May Hodkinson Trustee 25 September 2020
None on record
Katharine Lucy Von Schubert Trustee 25 September 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S PETERSHAM
Received: On time
Rev Dr Canon James Douglas Thomas Hawkey Trustee 02 April 2020
THE ARCHBISHOP'S EXAMINATION IN THEOLOGY TRUST
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF THE ANGLICAN CENTRE IN ROME
Received: On time
Victoria Jane Smith Trustee 04 April 2019
None on record
BENJAMIN WILLIAM EDWARD MORGAN Trustee 16 October 2018
None on record
Mary Oakes Trustee 01 October 2017
None on record
Dr KATHRYN ANN SHAH Trustee 16 March 2016
None on record
CHRISTINE ANNE CLAYTON Trustee 16 March 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.75m £4.24m £4.43m £3.81m £4.65m
Total expenditure £5.61m £4.56m £4.78m £4.57m £4.69m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.16m £3.69m £3.78m £3.32m £4.06m
Income - Other trading activities £405.00k £383.00k £469.00k £0 £374.00k
Income - Charitable activities £51.00k £55.00k £61.00k £366.00k £34.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £107.00k £96.00k £105.00k £99.00k £96.00k
Income - Other £26.00k £17.00k £18.00k £26.00k £80.00k
Income - Legacies £1.29m £823.00k £1.02m £1.05m £996.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.81m £3.59m £3.75m £3.84m £3.97m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.42m £613.00k £610.00k £331.00k £300.00k
Expenditure - Governance £144.00k £75.00k £0 £91.00k £105.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.04m £2.47m £2.42m £2.33m £2.30m
Expenditure - Investment management £22.00k £23.00k £24.00k £24.00k £0
Expenditure - Other £391.00k £352.00k £413.00k £399.00k £428.00k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £949.00k £901.00k £891.00k £885.00k £864.00k
Long-term investments £3.58m £3.59m £3.91m £3.36m £3.60m
Other assets £4.70m £4.32m £3.88m £3.02m £2.92m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £614.00k £495.00k £418.00k £331.00k £318.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 24 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 14 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Embrace The Middle East
Old Library Building
Queen Victoria Road
HIGH WYCOMBE
Buckinghamshire
HP11 1BG
Phone:
01494897950