Accounts and annual returns GARSTON AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY COUNCIL

Charity number: 1076031
Charity reporting is up to date (89 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 April 2025 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 April 2025 89 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 16 May 2024 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 16 May 2024 106 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 May 2023 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 May 2023 105 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 April 2022 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 April 2022 78 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window