Financial history GARSTON AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY COUNCIL

Charity number: 1076031
Charity reporting is up to date (89 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £51.90k £57.16k £56.98k £45.13k £47.96k
Total expenditure £55.92k £55.23k £47.84k £46.96k £51.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £19.07k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.00k £8.00k £19.07k £8.80k £0