Trustees ASSOCIATION OF BRITISH NEUROLOGISTS
Charity number: 1077893

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof Neil Patrick Robertson | Chair | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Laura Evans | Trustee | 09 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sean Slaght | Trustee | 09 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Grote | Trustee | 09 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Aisling Carr | Trustee | 09 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Croall | Trustee | 09 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Curl | Trustee | 09 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Krista Farrell | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ann Johnston | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sofia Helena Eriksson | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Arani Nitkunan | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gillian Elizabeth Stewart | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Michael Peter Lunn | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Timothy David Griffiths | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jeremy Harry Rees | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anjum Taban Misbahuddin | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Matthew Steven Jones | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Biba Rhiannon Stanton | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Davenport | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.