COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT ACTION HERTFORDSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Carrying out projects of a social nature within Hertfordshire and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £162,182 from 2 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 23 April 1999: Standard registration
- 28 January 2019: Funds received from 1140761 KALEIDOSCOPE ENTERPRISE LIMITED
- CDA FOR HERTS (Working name)
- COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT AGENCY FOR HERTFORDSHIRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Kofi Azilah | Trustee | 05 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Aneja | Trustee | 21 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Deards | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Dawson | Trustee | 15 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £189.69k | £293.46k | £314.00k | £369.03k | £348.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £274.32k | £183.85k | £350.05k | £381.84k | £347.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £69.78k | £102.41k | N/A | N/A | £162.18k | |
|
Income from government grants | £59.78k | £53.41k | £131.92k | £178.81k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 April 2024 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 April 2024 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 11TH FEBRUARY 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 19TH MAY 2000 AND 26TH AUGUST 2005. AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13 OCT 2014
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE GEOGRAPHICAL COUNTY OF HERTFORDSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY ASSISTING THE WORK OF STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN ADVANCING EDUCATION, FURTHERING HEALTH, RELIEVING POVERTY, DISTRESS OR SICKNESS, OR IN PURSUING ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES. B) TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE SAID PURPOSES AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER IN COUNCIL REPRESENTATIVES OF THE AUTHORITIES AND ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN FURTHERANCE OF THE SAID PURPOSES WITHIN THE GEOGRAPHICAL COUNTY OF HERTFORDSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
HERTFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 2
Mead Lane Industrial Estate
Merchant Drive
Hertford
SG13 7BH
- Phone:
- 01992289060
- Email:
- office@cdaherts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window