Financial history CHRISTIAN YOUTH MINISTRIES

Charity Number: 1075626
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £251.23k £287.67k £468.87k £285.00k £292.44k
Total expenditure £291.26k £257.52k £464.99k £308.42k £343.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A