Trustees DEVON AIR AMBULANCE TRUST
Charity number: 1077998

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Susan Pennack | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Becky Smith | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ian Anthony Fortune | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Jane Adams | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Peter Nicholson | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Darrell Lee Mann | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Burr | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Owen Davidson | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Michael Cramp | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Holman | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Ross Hemingway | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Ruth Smiley | Trustee | 26 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
William Lewis Fletcher Matthewman | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.