CHRIST CHURCH WILLESBOROUGH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is the advancement of the Christian faith in union with and according to the Principles and practicies of the Free Church of England otherwise called the Reformed Episiopal Church contained within the Declaration of Principles. To advance the Christian faith for the benefit of the public, Conducting of public worship,encouraging faith commitment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 21 February 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
H E MILLS | Chair | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Raine | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
NORMAN THOMAS SMISSEN | Trustee | 24 August 2012 |
|
|
||||||
MS A I TABERHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MRS E MCKEEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
COLIN CHRISTOPHER MILLS | Trustee |
|
||||||||
LESLEY SECKER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.35k | £13.16k | £17.13k | £12.72k | £14.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.62k | £12.84k | £16.42k | £19.40k | £20.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 FEBRUARY 2010.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN UNION WITH AND ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND OTHERWISE CALLED THE REFORMED EPISCOPAL CHURCH CONTAINED WITHIN THE DECLARATION OF PRINCIPLES AS STATED IN SCHEDULE 1.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 COLLARD ROAD
WILLESBOROUGH
ASHFORD
TN24 0JR
- Phone:
- 01233627072
- Email:
- C.MILLS948@BTINTERNET.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window