PETERSHAM ENVIRONMENT TRUST LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To protect, conserve, maintain and the natural environment and other amenities in Petersham and its Environs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 06 September 1999: Standard registration
- PETERSHAM TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM BALL | Chair | 29 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Wheeldon | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Davis | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anne Fiona Powell | Trustee | 31 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £595 | £250 | £45.68k | £95 | £595 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.68k | £986 | £37.80k | £10.14k | £1.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 February 2025 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 February 2025 | 465 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 March 2021 | 150 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30TH JULY 1999 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22 OCT 2012
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROTECT, CONSERVE, MAINTAIN AND ENHANCE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, SUCH LAND, BUILDINGS AND OTHER AMENITIES OF PERTERSHAM IN SURREY AND ITS ENVIRONS AS ARE OF PUBLIC INTEREST (INCLUDING WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY PETERSHAM MEADOWS, OFF PETERSHAM ROAD, RICHMOND-UPON-THAMES, SURREY AS REFERRED TO IN THE RICHMOND, PETERSHAM AND HAM OPEN SPACES ACT 1902) AND IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY) BY REFERENCE TO THEIR NATURAL BEAUTY, HISTORICAL INTEREST AND ECOLOGICAL VALUE; (B) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN RELATION TO THE LAND, BUILDINGS AND OTHER AMENITIES REFERRED TO IN (A) ABOVE AND IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY) THEIR NATURAL BEAUTY, HISTORICAL INTEREST AND ECOLOGICAL VALUE; AND (C) TO ENHANCE PUBLIC ENJOYMENT OF THE LAND, BUILDINGS AND OTHER AMENITIES REFERRED TO IN (A) ABOVE IN SUCH MANNER AS IS CONSISTENT WITH THEIR NATURAL BEAUTY, HISTORICAL AND ECOLOGICAL VALUE.
Area of benefit
PETERSHAM IN SURREY
Contact information
- Address:
-
WILSHERS & CO
10-11 HEATHFIELD TERRACE
HORTICULTURAL PLACE
LONDON
W4 4JE
- Phone:
- 02089955800
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window