FORWARD HOUSING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of specialist accommodation for people with a learning disability
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,175,887
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.18m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,356,158
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.36m | |
Other | £0 |
£953,816 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £72,973 from 1 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.36m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.36m | |
Retained for future use | £773.55k |
People

3 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 November 1999: Standard registration
- FORWARD HOUSING SW (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harry Charles McKeown | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Kathryn Elizabeth Platts | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|||||||
Joshua Prince | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
John Smith | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
Gareth Anthony Jackson | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
JEAN CURD | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|||||||
Matthew Smith | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.34m | £2.06m | £1.68m | £1.91m | £2.18m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.53m | £1.86m | £2.00m | £2.28m | £2.36m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £179.30k | £17.93k | £54.82k | £72.97k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £6.32k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.34m | £1.51m | £1.67m | £1.91m | £2.18m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £545.11k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.52m | £1.86m | £2.00m | £2.28m | £2.36m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £8.40k | £939 | £705 | £167 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £62.53k | £59.09k | £55.64k | £52.26k | £48.76k | |
|
Long-term investments | £8.99m | £8.94m | £10.45m | £10.91m | £11.87m | |
|
Other assets | £524.37k | £491.25k | £245.36k | £92.87k | £419.17k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £4.74m | £4.96m | £6.35m | £6.76m | £7.26m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 AUG 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 OCT 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 AUG 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 DEC 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04 JAN 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 JUL 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 SEP 2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30 JUN 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT SERVICES INCLUDING SERVICES IN THE SUPPORT OF RESIDENTIAL, RESPITE AND OTHER FORMS OF CARE, EDUCATION AND WORK OPPORTUNITIES AND BY THE PROMOTION OF AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS AND THE CHARITY CAN DO ALL THINGS THAT ARE INCIDENTAL OR CONDUCIVE TO ITS OBJECTS OR ANY OF THEM.
Area of benefit
ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE WEST HOUSE
ALPHA COURT
SWINGBRIDGE ROAD
GRANTHAM
LINCOLNSHIRE
NG31 7XT
- Phone:
- 03003031280
- Email:
- office@thera.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window