Accounts and annual returns ROTARY CLUB OF LOUGHTON TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1077732
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 383 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 383 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 17 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 28 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 28 March 2022 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required