Financial history THE MARY POTTER CONVENT HOSPITAL TRUST

Charity Number: 1078525
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £144.54k £113.99k £171.27k £165.24k £160.72k
Total expenditure £192.24k £138.03k £187.02k £202.58k £171.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A