SPIRITUAL ASSEMBLY OF THE BAHA'IS OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities focus on the advancement of the Baha'i Faith and belief in the essential oneness of the world's revealed religions and on Baha'i ideals of human brotherhood through various means including devotional meetings, children's classes, youth activities, study sessions and interfaith involvement
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 October 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ramin Habibi | Trustee | 20 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Ann Habibi | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ilona Petronella Kater | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Meera Arumugam | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr PAUL RHYS | Trustee | 21 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eric Harshfield | Trustee | 21 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MISS Katherin Lee | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mahsa Naraghi-Arani | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Prof NITA FOROUHI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.26k | £6.58k | £4.81k | £6.57k | £7.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.16k | £10.54k | £5.80k | £6.23k | £7.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 SEPTEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE BAHA'I FAITH, SHARING THE IDEALS OF OUR FELLOW BAHA'IS AND ASSISTING THEIR EFFORTS TO ESTABLISH, UPHOLD AND PROMOTE THE SPIRITUAL, EDUCATIONAL AND HUMANITARIAN TEACHINGS OF HUMAN BROTHERHOOD, RADIANT FAITH, EXALTED CHARACTER AND SELFLESS LOVE REVEALED IN THE LIVES AND UTTERANCES OF ALL THE PROPHETS AND MESSENGERS OF GOD, FOUNDERS OF THE WORLD'S REVEALED RELIGIONS, AND GIVEN RENEWED CREATIVE ENERGY AND UNIVERSAL APPLICATION TO THE CONDITIONS OF THIS AGE IN THE LIFE AND UTTERANCES OF BAHA'U'LLAH (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAHA'I FAITH (C) THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OF CAMBRIDGE AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD WHETHER BAHA'IS OR NOT (D) THE ESTABLISHMENT IN CAMBRIDGE, AS SOON AS RESOURCES PERMIT, OF A HOUSE OF WORSHIP AND ITS ASSOCIATED INSTITUTIONS (E) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE ASSEMBLY MAY DECIDE
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGE AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
SPIRITUAL ASSEMBLY OF THE BAHA'I
27 RUTLAND GATE
LONDON
SW7 1PD
- Phone:
- 02075842566
- Email:
- incorps@bahai.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window