THE FRIENDS OF ARUNDEL CATHEDRAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The maintenance, support, service, carrying on and development of the Roman Catholic Cathedral of Our Lady and St Philip Howard at Arundel, West Sussex.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- West Sussex
Governance
- 10 November 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Georgina Fitzalan-Howard | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Charles Philip Richard Moth | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr SANDRA DIANE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
margaret burgess | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sandra Diane Williams | Trustee | 23 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARIA WHITEHOUSE | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN HALL | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charles Sommer | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAUL WALKER | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MCCOMBE | Trustee | 15 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL CORBY | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Margaret Kilmartin | Trustee | 23 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr JAMES MICHAEL MEADE WALSH | Trustee | 18 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BARRY HEATHCOTE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.77k | £169.20k | £63.65k | £54.76k | £56.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.25k | £94.13k | £89.68k | £97.57k | £100.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 JUNE 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE BY ANY EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS THE MAINTENANCE, SUPPORT, SERVICE, CARRYING ON AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CATHEDRAL OF OUR LADY AND ST PHILIP HOWARD AT ARUNDEL IN THE COUNTY OF WEST SUSSEX (THE CATHEDRAL)
Area of benefit
WEST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
The St Philip Howard Centre
4 Southgate Drive
CRAWLEY
West Sussex
RH10 6RP
- Phone:
- 012073859705
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window