Financial history THAMES CHRISTIAN SCHOOL

Charity number: 1081666
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.00m £2.30m £2.71m £2.94m £3.92m
Total expenditure £1.92m £2.09m £2.59m £3.12m £4.15m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £21.73k £40.03k £7.08k £10.60k £33.89k
Income - Other trading activities £7.20k £10.43k £0 £0 £12.85k
Income - Charitable activities £1.97m £2.25m £2.69m £2.92m £3.85m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.97k £37 £367 £6.10k £27.50k
Income - Other £0 £0 £12.24k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.92m £2.09m £2.59m £3.12m £4.15m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £30.08k £25.18k £25.09k £38.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0