STOCKPORT CARE SCHEMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to promote the relief of persons who are aged, sick or who have disabilities and are in need of care and support, by provision of support services and information to such persons and their carers in Stockport; to carry out such other charitable purpose or purposes as the Trustees in their absolute discretion shall from time to time determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £154,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Stockport
Governance
- 05 April 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen O'Sullivan | Chair | 18 May 2016 |
|
|||||
JOHN WILSON | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
COLIN BIRTLES | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Anne Cunliffe | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shanthini Alexander | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Faragher | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Rogers | Trustee | 22 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Andy Wardle | Trustee | 03 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE BAKEWELL | Trustee | 24 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £231.83k | £168.81k | £211.30k | £232.94k | £297.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £228.43k | £179.45k | £221.45k | £239.87k | £249.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £108.00k | £108.00k | £108.00k | £140.00k | £154.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 FEB 2002 as amended on 22 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE AGED, SICK OR HAVE DISABILITIES AND ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND SUPPORT, BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT SERVICES AND INFORMATION TO SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR CARERS IN STOCKPORT. TO CARRY OUT SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
STOCKPORT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Heaton Moor Centre
Thornfield Road
Stockport
SK4 3LD
- Phone:
- 01614762812
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window