BLANDFORD STOUR ROTARY CLUB TRUST FUND
Charity number: 1079916
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising for local and Rotary charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2021
Total income: £3,041
Total expenditure: £4,763
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
- Dorset
Governance
Registration history:
- 21 March 2000: Standard registration
- 25 April 2025: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 25 April 2025: Funds transferred to 1032049 ROTARY CLUB OF BLANDFORD BENEVOLENT FUND
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- BLANDFORD STOUR ROTARY CLUB (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.36k | £17.65k | £11.74k | £4.96k | £3.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.91k | £12.36k | £16.02k | £8.08k | £4.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 14 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 14 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 379 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 379 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 745 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 745 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 17 June 2021 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Submit annual return
Open in new window
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE ON 15 DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE CLUB SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE BLANDFORD STOUR.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window