Financial history WWF - UK

Charity number: 1081247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £80.84m £84.36m £91.04m £94.04m £92.47m
Total expenditure £78.28m £82.61m £92.14m £102.41m £95.43m
Income from government contracts £11.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £769.00k £710.00k £1.80m £3.83m £4.26m
Income - Donations and legacies £69.05m £73.86m £79.15m £78.66m £76.83m
Income - Other trading activities £7.16m £6.94m £6.76m £7.62m £6.73m
Income - Charitable activities £3.80m £2.96m £4.45m £6.60m £7.43m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £841.00k £600.00k £669.00k £1.16m £1.48m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £16.96m £15.42m £15.35m £17.38m £16.36m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £59.84m £61.94m £69.14m £78.48m £70.83m
Expenditure - Raising funds £18.44m £20.68m £22.84m £23.90m £24.59m
Expenditure - Governance £586.00k £841.00k £1.11m £1.09m £1.95m
Expenditure - Grants institution £31.01m £26.41m £33.19m £39.88m £37.02m
Expenditure - Investment management £190.00k £209.00k £222.00k £233.00k £252.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £157.00k £34.00k £0