THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF PERSONNEL AND DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1079797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The purpose of the CIPD is to champion better work and working lives by improving practices in people and organisational development. To achieve this, the Institute pursues a wide range of activities including research, surveys, publications, advisory services, training courses, conferences, contributions to public policy and extensive media coverage.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Ireland
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland
  • Singapore
  • United Arab Emirates

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 March 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CIPD (Working name)
  • CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF PERSONNEL AND DEVELOPMENT (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Valerie Hughes D'Aeth Chair 14 April 2021
None on record
Heather Lee Trustee 14 January 2025
None on record
Amanda Boustred Trustee 14 January 2025
None on record
Antony Lorman Trustee 14 January 2025
None on record
Brian Walters Trustee 20 April 2023
None on record
Caroline Stockmann Trustee 13 December 2022
THE GUILDHALL SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
Noel Tagoe Trustee 03 October 2022
None on record
Dr Susan Round Trustee 14 April 2021
None on record
Nicholas Williams Trustee 18 June 2020
None on record
Jonathan Ferrar Trustee 07 November 2017
None on record
PETER CHEESE Trustee 30 April 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £40.66m £38.55m £42.35m £45.01m £47.68m
Total expenditure £40.62m £37.76m £43.32m £51.63m £52.71m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £10.51m £9.25m £12.10m £14.26m £14.43m
Income - Charitable activities £29.98m £29.25m £30.22m £30.72m £33.04m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £169.00k £50.00k £38.00k £36.00k £215.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £30.93m £29.62m £34.09m £41.17m £42.80m
Expenditure - Raising funds £9.68m £8.14m £9.23m £10.46m £9.91m
Expenditure - Governance £47.00k £38.00k £80.00k £43.00k £53.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £119.56k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £50.00k £50.00k £35.00k £25.00k £25.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets £7.92m £9.62m £9.29m £8.98m £8.75m
Long-term investments £25.71m £28.44m £26.52m £22.44m £18.31m
Other assets £11.91m £12.91m £13.71m £13.57m £16.16m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£17.06m -£12.94m -£5.15m -£7.46m -£8.54m
Total liabilities £11.36m £11.84m £12.69m £12.66m £13.28m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 03 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 03 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 18 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 18 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 27 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 27 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 10 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 10 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 04 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 04 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF
PERSONNEL AND DEVELOPMENT
151 THE BROADWAY
LONDON
SW19 1JQ
Phone:
02086126200