CABI TRUST

Charity number: 1080273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Its mission is to promote, aid and further the charitable objects and the charitable work of CAB International (CABI) by obtaining funds and providing finance for qualifying projects which CABI undertakes particularly, but not exclusively in its Information for Development and Bioscience areas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £99
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Brazil
  • China
  • Ghana
  • India
  • Kenya
  • Malaysia
  • Pakistan
  • Switzerland
  • Trinidad And Tobago

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 April 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Leonard Kimutai Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Dr Daniel Elger Trustee 05 July 2022
None on record
DAVID ENDICOTT Trustee
THE TWINKLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.67k £184 £475 £23 £99
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
C A B INTERNATIONAL
NOSWORTHY WAY
MONGEWELL
WALLINGFORD
OX10 8DE
Phone:
01491829362