BANGOR NEW MUSIC FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Present an annual festival of new music predominantly but not exclusively in Powis Hall, Bangor University. The festival incorporates workshops involving students at local schools in Gwynedd and Anglesey.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Conwy
- Gwynedd
- Isle Of Anglesey
Governance
- 29 October 2008: Standard registration
- BANGOR MUSIC FESTIVAL (Working name)
- BNMF (Working name)
- GGNB (Working name)
- GWYL GERDD BANGOR (Working name)
- GWYL GERDD NEWYDD BANGOR (Working name)
- 'GWYL GERDD BANGOR' (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Rhiannon Mathias MPhil PhD | Chair |
|
||||||||
Seren Haf Jones | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
John Hywel Morris | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Guto Pryderi Puw | Trustee | 19 September 2008 |
|
|
||||||
CLIVE FREDERICK SMART MA FCA | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.66k | £23.27k | £26.84k | £23.91k | £29.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.90k | £21.21k | £25.89k | £21.55k | £32.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £8.95k | £8.98k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.95k | £8.98k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2022
(These accounts |
17 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 13 May 2021 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 SEPTEMBER 208
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM SOLELY TOWARDS THE PROMOTION OF THE OBJECTS, HEREIN AFTER REFERRED TO AS THE OBJECTS, OF THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ARTS OF MUSIC, DANCE, DRAMA, POETRY, TELEVISION AND FILM. IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY: I) TO GIVE THE WIDE PUBLIC THE OPPORTUNITY TO EXPERIENCE AND LEARN ABOUT CONTEMPORARY MUSIC, II) TO COMMISSION AND/OR PERFORM MUSIC BY COMPOSERS OF VARIOUS NATIONALITIES, INCLUDING WELSH COMPOSERS AND COMPOSERS LIVING OR WORKING IN WALES, III) TO ENABLE THE CREATION AND PERFORMANCE OF CONTEMPORARY MUSIC BY SCHOOL PUPILS STUDENTS AND THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Department of Music
Drama and Performance
Bangor University
College Road
BANGOR
Gwynedd
- Phone:
- 01248382181
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window