THE HELPFUL BUREAU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help people live independently at home by providing a range of practical services, advice, information, signposting and social activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £41,150 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
62 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 12 March 2001: Standard registration
- 31 August 2021: Funds received from 1122039 VOLUNTARY ACTION BROXTOWE
- STAPLEFORD BUREAU (Working name)
- STAPLEFORD VOLUNTEER BUREAU (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Jeremiah | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steph Reston | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Paterson | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Bowen | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN FOX | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.54k | £219.87k | £148.25k | £197.89k | £272.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £134.18k | £151.19k | £168.88k | £215.79k | £272.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £3.35k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £56.38k | £73.95k | £59.98k | £46.49k | £41.15k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 February 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 February 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 FEBRUARY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 01 NOVEMBER 2004 AND 22 SEPTEMBER 2006. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20 JANUARY 2009.
Charitable objects
TO UNDERTAKE VOLUNTARY WORK IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE COMMUNITY AND OTHER SIMILAR CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AMONGST THOSE PEOPLE IN NEED THEREOF IN NOTTINGHAMSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT")
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Helpful Bureau
145-147 Derby Road
Stapleford
NOTTINGHAM
NG9 7AS
- Phone:
- 01159491175
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window