BAMPTON CLASSICAL OPERA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity advances education for the public benefit by performing opera and other music at a high standard, concentrating on rare 18th-century repertory sung in English. Supporting the early development of outstanding young professional performers, the charity aims at an accessible and relaxed ethos with affordable ticket prices. It works beyond its area of operation when appropriate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £900 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
- Oxfordshire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 03 May 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hilary Jane Reid Evans | Chair | 12 November 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||
SIMON HOPE BROADBENT | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||
Andrew Hugh Penny | Trustee | 19 January 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||
MS GILLY FRENCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||
MICHAEL ST JOHN PARKER | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||
DR J P GRAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.69k | £61.07k | £119.21k | £132.41k | £154.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.02k | £29.06k | £125.54k | £127.00k | £153.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.25k | £900 | £900 | £900 | £900 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 FEBRUARY 1999 as amended on 19 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE ART OF OPERA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE OXFORDSHIRE, GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLCOT HOUSE
MARKET SQUARE
BAMPTON
OX18 2JJ
- Phone:
- 01993851876
- Email:
- mail@bamptonopera.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window