Accounts and annual returns DRAYCOTT AND RODNEY STOKE CHURCH OF ENGLAND FIRST SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1082140
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 17 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 13 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 17 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 11 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 03 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required