Accounts and annual returns IMOGEN TAYLOR CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1086150
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 23 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 23 December 2024 322 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 13 June 2023 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 23 December 2022 321 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 02 February 2022 362 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required