LOUGHBOROUGH SCHOOLS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity exists to operate four independent schools providing for pupils aged from 3 to 18. The aim is to attain the highest academic levels and ensure an extra-curricular programme which will develope life long interests and a desire to contribute to the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£36,551,000
Donations and legacies | £392.00k | |
Charitable activities | £34.99m | |
Other trading activities | £489.00k | |
Investments | £442.00k | |
Other | £242.00k |
Total expenditure:
£36,308,000
Raising funds | £798.00k | |
Charitable activities | £35.51m | |
Other | £0 |
-£164,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £645,000 from 5 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £798.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £35.51m | |
Retained for future use | £243.00k |
People

741 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 10 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 3 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£130k to £140k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 28 July 2000: Standard registration
- 01 February 2017: Funds received from 1110802 OUR LADY'S CONVENT SCHOOL
- LOUGHBOROUGH ENDOWED SCHOOLS (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Harrison | Chair | 27 November 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Robert William James Saunt | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Katharine Basey | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Gowers-Cromie | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Leese | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
Andrew Bowden | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Jason Cimurs | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Ann Clark | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr JAMES ESSON | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Anna Murphy | Trustee | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Sister Celine Leydon | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||||
ROWENA JANE ELIZABETH LIMB | Trustee | 25 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.39m | £30.69m | £31.84m | £34.10m | £36.55m | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.06m | £31.46m | £32.81m | £33.47m | £36.31m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £645.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.08m | £219.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £631.00k | £86.00k | £111.00k | £377.00k | £392.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £726.00k | £428.00k | £523.00k | £528.00k | £489.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £29.87m | £30.05m | £31.02m | £32.79m | £34.99m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £163.00k | £123.00k | £138.00k | £218.00k | £442.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £45.00k | £186.00k | £242.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £30.59m | £31.15m | £32.28m | £32.78m | £35.51m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £466.00k | £312.00k | £530.00k | £696.00k | £798.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £292.00k | £302.00k | £291.00k | £317.00k | £396.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £67.88m | £67.50m | £66.36m | £64.99m | £63.97m | |
|
Long-term investments | £4.15m | £4.14m | £5.05m | £4.85m | £4.80m | |
|
Other assets | £3.00m | £6.14m | £7.21m | £7.94m | £8.07m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £6.37m | £9.99m | £10.89m | £9.81m | £8.79m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 July 2020 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 07 July 2020 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/07/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/10/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/03/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/07/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/07/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 MAY 2018 AS AMENDED ON 21 MAR 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 MAY 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY CARRYING ON IN GREAT BRITAIN A SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS WHICH MAY BE DAY OR BOARDING AT WHICH INFANTS, CHILDREN AND STUDENTS MAY OBTAIN EDUCATION AND INSTRUCTION IN ACADEMIC, SPORTING, MUSICAL, CULTURAL, SCIENTIFIC, TECHNICAL, RELIGIOUS, VOCATIONAL, SOCIAL AND COMMERCIAL SUBJECTS ACTIVITIES AND CRAFTS OF EVERY DESCRIPTION AND BY ANCILLARY OR INCIDENTAL EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 BURTON WALKS
LOUGHBOROUGH
LE11 2DU
- Phone:
- 01509 283700
- Email:
- secretary.board@lsf.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window