Accounts and annual returns CITIZENS ONLINE

Charity Number: 1087794
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 19 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 19 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 17 January 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 19 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 09 December 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On Time