Financial history WINGS SOUTH WEST

Charity number: 1082938
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £247.81k £299.04k £241.56k £240.39k £330.57k
Total expenditure £305.69k £214.48k £243.52k £269.52k £331.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £71.84k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £59.40k £60.98k £4.15k £12.20k £12.20k