Financial history PHILANTHROPY IMPACT

Charity number: 1089157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £241.07k £302.00k £306.00k £326.00k £308.34k
Total expenditure £236.54k £302.00k £307.50k £326.00k £308.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A