JOSEPHINE BAKER TRUST

Charity Number: 1086222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting the education and training of members of the public in singing and in the study of vocal music and by helping talented singers in the early years of their singing careers.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,481
Total expenditure: £15,114

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 April 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Sarah Jane Tenant-Flowers Trustee 24 October 2022
None on record
JONATHAN WILLCOCKS MA, HONRAM Trustee 06 October 2017
YEHUDI MENUHIN SCHOOL LIMITED
Received: On time
CHILDREN'S CONCERTS
Received: On time
SOUTHERN PRO MUSICA
Received: On time
DAVID WILLCOCKS MUSIC TRUST
Received: On time
RICHARD KEITH PEARCE Trustee 18 November 2013
None on record
ROBERT CHARLES PORTER Trustee
None on record
David John Munro Trustee
Wrecclesham Community Centre
Received: On time
WHY ME? UK
Received: On time
FARNHAM SWIMMING BATHS TRUST
Received: On time
SURREY MINORITY ETHNIC FORUM LTD
Received: On time
ANTHONY HASLAM RAMSDEN Trustee
HASLEMERE SPORTS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £468.90k £40.91k £9 £337 £1.48k
Total expenditure £21.41k £5.69k £4.80k £17.31k £15.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 04 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 August 2020 On Time
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Grange Cottage
Frensham Road
Frensham
Farnham
GU10 3DS
Phone:
01252792485
Website:

Https://www.josephinebakertrust.org