Financial history BEENHAM WIND ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1087848
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £6.48k £2.69k £8.57k £9.85k £11.69k
Total expenditure £6.40k £3.30k £7.80k £12.93k £11.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A