REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD ("RCCG") MOUNT ZION

Charity number: 1084573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principal objective is the advancement of the Christian faith worldwide and relief of poverty

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £212,526
Total expenditure: £153,560

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 January 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RCCG MOUNT ZION (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PASTOR RICHARD OLUKAYODE ODEJAYI Chair
None on record
VALENTINA OLUBISI AKINYINKA Trustee
None on record
ABEL AKINTUNDE AJUNWON Trustee
LOVE OF GOD CHURCH AND MINISTRIES
Charity reporting is overdue by 1550 days
PASTOR OLADELE BAKARE Trustee
REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD - WINNERS SANCTUARY
Received: On time
REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD LORD'S VINE PARISH
Received: On time
Olufemi Olukayode Adebajo Trustee
REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD OVERCOMERS ASSEMBLY
Received: On time
REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD (RCCG) FAITH CHAPEL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £177.26k £176.43k £195.51k £213.35k £212.53k
Total expenditure £133.86k £115.15k £139.98k £135.74k £153.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 July 2024 247 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 04 July 2024 247 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 30 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
275 OLD KENT ROAD
LONDON
SE1 5LU
Phone:
02072520232