WIRRAL CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity number: 1087451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Advice and support for vunerable people within the community, sports and recreational activities for young people, providing a place of worship for the local community. Operating a feeding initiative for disadvantaged people including the homeless. Offering job search support and appropriate advocacy. Demonstrating practically and presenting effectivly the love of God.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Wirral

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 July 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • NEW FERRY CHRISTIAN CENTRE (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Gregory James Epton Trustee 25 July 2023
WORLDWIDE CHRISTIAN TRUST
Received: On time
TOGETHER FOR THE HARVEST
Received: On time
WIRRAL CHRISTIAN CENTRE TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Rev PAUL ANTHONY EPTON Trustee
WORLDWIDE CHRISTIAN TRUST
Received: On time
WIRRAL CHRISTIAN CENTRE TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
EVELYN JANE EPTON Trustee
None on record
NICK WEYMAN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 15 January 2025 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 20 December 2023 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 10 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 04 February 2022 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 20 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 04 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Gateway Church Wirral
Woodchurch Road
BIRKENHEAD
Merseyside
CH41 2UF
Phone:
07867988230
Website:

No information available