Financial history THE CHILTERN SOCIETY

Charity number: 1085163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £473.05k £434.22k £584.64k £866.13k £702.98k
Total expenditure £464.51k £434.14k £529.83k £882.17k £600.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £23.68k £67.13k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £50.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £481.71k £116.46k £592.89k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £17.40k £8.77k £6.25k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £75.56k £55.87k £76.64k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £9.97k £18.07k £27.20k
Income - Other N/A N/A £1 £666.96k £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £194.92k £95.66k £114.09k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £410.74k £749.64k £505.78k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £119.09k £132.53k £94.43k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £12.44k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0