SPAN ARTS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Co-Created social change and empowerment through the arts. SPAN Arts harness the power of the arts as a vehicle for social change. We work to challenge inequality, champion diverse voices, and build connections in our evolving community. We work hand in hand with artists and our community to co-create, co-commission, and co-design solutions to the social challenges we face.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £16,480 from 2 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
77 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Carmarthenshire
- Ceredigion
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 03 October 2001: Standard registration
- 06 February 2025: Funds received from 1169337 THEATRE VERSUS OPPRESSION
- SPAN (PEMBROKESHIRE) LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sue Lewis | Chair | 27 November 2019 |
|
|||||||
Omar Al-Kamil | Trustee | 24 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Ruth Margaret Cottam | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rhidian Evans | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jonathan Chitty | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Carys Mol | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dea Neile-Hopton | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
CATHERINE DENISE DAVIES | Trustee | 29 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £207.84k | £147.25k | £234.45k | £143.54k | £246.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £203.91k | £130.37k | £143.49k | £207.31k | £226.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £48.82k | £16.48k | |
|
Income from government grants | £43.03k | £40.24k | N/A | £73.14k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 JANUARY 2001, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25 JULY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 4 JULY 2002, AS AMENDED BY EXTRAORDINARY MEETING OF 15 AUGUST 2006.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES BY THE STAGING OF VISUAL AND PERFORMING ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SPAN ARTS LTD
THE TOWN MOOR
MOORFIELD ROAD
NARBERTH
SA67 7AG
- Phone:
- 01834 869323
- Email:
- finance@span-arts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window