SHERBORNE U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of facilities for leisure time and recreational facilities in order to improve life for middle aged and elderly people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
- Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 29 March 2001: Standard registration
- SHERBORNE THIRD AGE TRUST (Previous name)
- SHERBORNE THIRD AGE TRUST U3A (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Douglas Blythe Fuller | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Newcombe | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Diana Stephens | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Martin | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Dale | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Wills | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
MS SUE THOMAS-PETER | Trustee | 14 November 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.02k | £15.01k | £17.67k | £24.12k | £22.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.25k | £4.60k | £21.48k | £22.42k | £27.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 MARCH 2001. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
SHERBORNE AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Castleton Court
SHERBORNE
Dorset
DT9 3FD
- Phone:
- 07835265163
- Website:
-
sherborne.u3asite.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window